U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arriaga-Ortiz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 11, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 08, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 15, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • November 15, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • October 09, 2018: [Status Report ]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order]
  • September 27, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Order]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 03, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 27, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • July 18, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • July 13, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.