U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Del Rosario
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 04, 2018: [Plea and Sentence]
  • October 04, 2018: [Downward Departure]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • October 04, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • October 04, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • October 04, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 02, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • September 10, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 02, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 23, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.