U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. De La Cruz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 24, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 16, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order]
  • March 28, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 26, 2019: [Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • November 29, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • November 29, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 16, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • October 16, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 16, 2018: [Status Report ]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Order]
  • September 24, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 12, 2018: [Status Report ]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order]
  • September 07, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 07, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Order]
  • August 15, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 03, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • August 01, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 25, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • July 25, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.