U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Matlack
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [Forfeiture - Final Order]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Declaration]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Order]
  • February 13, 2019: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 26, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • October 26, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • October 26, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 10, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Order]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 15, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 07, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 03, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • August 01, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 26, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 26, 2018: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 26, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • July 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2018: [Arrest ]
  • July 26, 2018: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • July 25, 2018: [Case Sealed]
  • July 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • July 25, 2018: [Warrant ]
  • July 25, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • July 25, 2018: [Indictment - Sealed]
  • July 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • July 25, 2018: [Seal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.