U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:08-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Matthew Palmer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 23, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • July 30, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.