U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Timothy Keyes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • September 02, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • August 24, 2022: [Vacate - 2255]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 11, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order]
  • December 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 27, 2021: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • December 27, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 22, 2021: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • December 21, 2021: [Stay]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 20, 2021: [Appear]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [--Transcript]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Address updated]
  • September 24, 2021: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL - Other]
  • September 13, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 10, 2021: [Sentencing]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Letter]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Letter]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order]
  • June 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 15, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 09, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Letter]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Letter]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Letter]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 20, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 20, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 06, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 06, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • January 07, 2020: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order]
  • December 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 27, 2019: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • December 20, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • December 17, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • December 17, 2019: [Release from Custody]
  • December 17, 2019: [Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 14, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Order]
  • February 22, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Order]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 15, 2018: [Declaration]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Notice of Service]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order]
  • September 06, 2018: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
  • September 06, 2018: [Redacted Document]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order]
  • August 22, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 06, 2018: [Status Report ]
  • August 06, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.