U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Freeman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 21, 2025: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • March 21, 2025: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Mail Returned]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • August 14, 2020: [Letter]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Letter]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice of Service]
  • June 24, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • June 19, 2020: [Release from Custody]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Order]
  • May 05, 2020: [Forfeiture - Final Order]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Declaration]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 10, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order]
  • December 06, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 02, 2019: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Letter]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 08, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • August 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • August 08, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • August 08, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • August 08, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 01, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order]
  • July 31, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 31, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Letter]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order]
  • May 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 17, 2019: [Status Report ]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • April 22, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 22, 2019: [Order]
  • April 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 19, 2019: [Speedy Trial - Waive Speedy Trial]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 08, 2019: [Letter]
  • April 05, 2019: [Dismiss]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order]
  • March 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 13, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order]
  • March 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2019: [Status Report ]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 25, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 18, 2019: [Exclude]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order]
  • December 21, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 17, 2018: [Status Report ]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 31, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 26, 2018: [Status Report ]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 04, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 02, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order]
  • September 24, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 24, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order]
  • September 18, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 14, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • September 13, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order]
  • September 04, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Remark]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 24, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • August 22, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • August 17, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.