U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 02, 2021: [Mail Returned]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Mail Returned]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [AEDPA - Election Form]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order - AEDPA]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • September 29, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • September 23, 2020: [Vacate - 2255]
  • September 22, 2020: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • September 01, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • August 27, 2020: [Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Letter]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • August 20, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • August 28, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 28, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • August 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • August 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 28, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • August 28, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 28, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • August 19, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 17, 2019: [Exclude]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 22, 2019: [Exclude]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 13, 2019: [Exclude]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • February 22, 2019: [Exclude]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 02, 2019: [Exclude]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 13, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
  • October 11, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 10, 2018: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 03, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • October 02, 2018: [Response to Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • September 11, 2018: [Letter]
  • September 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 07, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 30, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • August 30, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 27, 2018: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • August 24, 2018: [Remark]
  • August 24, 2018: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • August 22, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • August 17, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.