U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:07-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Patrick
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • March 03, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order]
  • January 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 25, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 15, 2021: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 19, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 16, 2020: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • December 16, 2020: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • December 16, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • January 08, 2020: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order]
  • March 27, 2019: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • March 12, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 08, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • March 08, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 01, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • February 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2019: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 19, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • August 22, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.