U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 09, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 08, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 02, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 05, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • February 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • February 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 17, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 15, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 01, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 01, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 29, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • August 29, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • August 29, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • August 23, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 23, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • August 23, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 23, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 23, 2018: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • August 23, 2018: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.