U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Declaration]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 17, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 04, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • August 15, 2019: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • April 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • April 10, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 23, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 18, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 18, 2018: [Exclude]
  • October 02, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 30, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 30, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • August 30, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • August 30, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 29, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 27, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • August 27, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 27, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • August 27, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 27, 2018: [Arrest ]
  • August 27, 2018: [Criminal Complaint Unsealed]
  • August 27, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.