U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reynolds
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence- USSC Amendment -18:3582c2]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 10, 2021: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • March 09, 2021: [Response to Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment - 18:3582c2]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 13, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 07, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Order]
  • December 26, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 01, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 25, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 24, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • September 24, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • August 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 20, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • August 08, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 05, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • July 25, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Order]
  • June 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 20, 2019: [Remark]
  • June 20, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • June 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Order]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 02, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 05, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 09, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • January 08, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Order]
  • December 17, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 17, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order]
  • October 30, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 30, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 29, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 01, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Waiver of Speedy Trial Act]
  • September 28, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2018: [Speedy Trial - Waive Speedy Trial]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 28, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • September 28, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • September 28, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 28, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 21, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 21, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 12, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 05, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • September 05, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.