U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Santos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 21, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 21, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 15, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 15, 2019: [Reduce Sentence]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 06, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • February 06, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 16, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • January 08, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • January 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 07, 2019: [Status Report ]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 03, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order]
  • October 24, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 22, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order]
  • October 18, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 18, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • October 15, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Order]
  • September 25, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • September 13, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 13, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2018: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • September 13, 2018: [Rule 5c3 Documents Received - formerly Rule 40]
  • September 12, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 07, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • September 07, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 07, 2018: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.