U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nobles
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • May 19, 2021: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • May 14, 2021: [Remark]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • May 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • May 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 04, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Dismiss]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
  • November 14, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 01, 2018: [Case Reopened]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 24, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 24, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • October 24, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 24, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 23, 2018: [Arrest - Prob/Superv. Release Violation Only]
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • September 28, 2018: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • September 13, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order]
  • September 12, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 11, 2018: [Pleadings from Other District - Rule 5c3 - formerly rule 40]
  • September 11, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • September 11, 2018: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.