U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mowbray
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 18, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 13, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 08, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 15, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • March 14, 2019: [Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • December 20, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • December 20, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • December 20, 2018: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • December 20, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 20, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 11, 2018: [Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 30, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 05, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 05, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 03, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 03, 2018: [Oral Order]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • September 19, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 14, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • September 14, 2018: [Remark]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.