U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez-Rivera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 11, 2019: [Order]
  • April 11, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 04, 2019: [Return of Property - PostTrial]
  • April 04, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 22, 2019: [Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • January 09, 2019: [Letter]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order]
  • November 02, 2018: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 26, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • October 26, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • October 26, 2018: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • October 26, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 25, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • October 25, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 25, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order]
  • October 19, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • October 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 20, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.