U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harper
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 22, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • April 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 11, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 12, 2019: [Protective Order]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 17, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • January 17, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • January 17, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 06, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Order]
  • November 02, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 01, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • October 04, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 25, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • September 25, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.