U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morales-Perez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • November 05, 2018: [Downward Departure]
  • November 05, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • November 05, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • November 05, 2018: [Plea and Sentence]
  • November 05, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order]
  • October 29, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 29, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 24, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 03, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 02, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.