U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bacon et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 18, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2023: [--Transcript]
  • January 04, 2023: [--Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
November, 2022
  • November 20, 2022: [New Trial ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order for Jury Lunch]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 17, 2022: [Jury Notes (Sealed)]
  • November 16, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • November 16, 2022: [Jury Verdict]
  • November 10, 2022: [Jury Trial Held]
  • November 08, 2022: [Jury Selection]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Remark]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Verdict Sheet - Proposed]
  • September 16, 2022: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
  • September 16, 2022: [Voir Dire - Proposed]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 10, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 22, 2022: [Declaration]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Hearing]
  • June 03, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 03, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 01, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 31, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 31, 2022: [Status Conference - Deft. present]
  • May 31, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 26, 2022: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
  • March 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • February 28, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • February 22, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 22, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Executed]
  • February 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 15, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued]
  • February 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • February 01, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 30, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • January 30, 2022: [Voir Dire Questions]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 28, 2022: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
  • January 26, 2022: [Discovery]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Opposition]
  • January 24, 2022: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
  • January 24, 2022: [Verdict Sheet - Proposed]
  • January 24, 2022: [Voir Dire - Proposed]
  • January 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 20, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 20, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • January 18, 2022: [In Limine]
  • January 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 13, 2022: [--Transcript]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2022: [Suppress Evidence]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 04, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 29, 2021: [In Limine]
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • December 29, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 29, 2021: [Status Conference - Deft. present]
  • December 21, 2021: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • December 21, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 17, 2021: [Reply Brief/Memorandum]
  • December 17, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 16, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • December 13, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • December 13, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • December 12, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 09, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 07, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2021: [Joinder]
  • December 01, 2021: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
  • December 01, 2021: [Verdict Sheet - Proposed]
  • December 01, 2021: [Voir Dire - Proposed]
  • December 01, 2021: [In Limine]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 23, 2021: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
  • November 23, 2021: [--Transcript]
  • November 23, 2021: [Waiver of Counsel]
  • November 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2021: [Hearing]
  • November 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • November 17, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 08, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
  • November 01, 2021: [Waiver of Counsel]
  • November 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 27, 2021: [Hearing]
  • October 27, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 22, 2021: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
  • October 22, 2021: [--Transcript]
  • October 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [--Transcript]
  • August 04, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 04, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 04, 2021: [Status Report ]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 29, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 29, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 21, 2021: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • July 19, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • July 16, 2021: [Letter]
  • July 14, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [Suppress Evidence]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 21, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • May 21, 2021: [Exclude]
  • May 20, 2021: [Status Conference - Deft. not present]
  • May 14, 2021: [Letter]
  • May 04, 2021: [Exhibit to a Document]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Compel]
  • April 30, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 30, 2021: [Disclosure]
  • April 30, 2021: [Sever Defendant]
  • April 30, 2021: [Joinder]
  • April 30, 2021: [Strike]
  • April 30, 2021: [In Limine]
  • April 30, 2021: [Suppress Evidence]
  • April 30, 2021: [Discovery]
  • April 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2021: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 22, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • April 20, 2021: [Letter]
  • April 19, 2021: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • April 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Order]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 20, 2021: [Exclude]
  • January 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • January 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Status Report ]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • October 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Letter]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 06, 2020: [Status Report ]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • July 28, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 20, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 01, 2020: [Status Report ]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 29, 2020: [Letter]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order]
  • May 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • March 13, 2020: [Writ Returned Executed]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • March 11, 2020: [Letter]
  • March 10, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 10, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 10, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 09, 2020: [Vacate]
  • March 06, 2020: [Redacted Document]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 14, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 13, 2020: [Status Report ]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • January 09, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • December 27, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Letter]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 05, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • November 04, 2019: [Letter]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • September 23, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order]
  • September 23, 2019: [Letter]
  • September 13, 2019: [Status Report ]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 01, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 23, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 11, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • June 10, 2019: [Seal]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order]
  • March 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • March 15, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • March 15, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • March 04, 2019: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • March 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 29, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 18, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • January 18, 2019: [Indictment]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Letter]
  • December 10, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Letter]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order]
  • November 13, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 09, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order]
  • November 08, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2018: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • November 05, 2018: [Certificate of Good Standing]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • October 25, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • October 25, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 23, 2018: [CJA 30 - Appointment]
  • October 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 16, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • October 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 16, 2018: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • October 16, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • October 16, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • October 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 15, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 13, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 13, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • October 13, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • October 12, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • October 12, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • October 12, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • October 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 12, 2018: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • October 12, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • October 11, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • October 11, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • October 11, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 11, 2018: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 11, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 11, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 10, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • October 10, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order]
  • October 10, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.