U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [--Transcript]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
  • August 06, 2021: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Remark]
  • July 26, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • July 19, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Seal Document]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Letter]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate - 2255]
  • March 02, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Order]
  • February 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 03, 2021: [Response to Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • December 01, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Letter]
  • November 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [Letter]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • October 30, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 28, 2019: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • October 28, 2019: [Vacate - 2255]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.