U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Judd
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Exit Record]
  • September 20, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
  • September 01, 2022: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Exit Record]
  • August 30, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Declaration]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 09, 2021: [Sentencing]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Letter]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 26, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2019: [Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order]
  • December 14, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 29, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • November 29, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • November 29, 2018: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • November 29, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 21, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • November 19, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order]
  • November 19, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 09, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 25, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • October 25, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 25, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • October 25, 2018: [Criminal Complaint Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.