U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Evans et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Judgment - Amended]
  • April 08, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate - 2255]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 11, 2022: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 13, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • April 09, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 05, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Order]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Continue]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Order]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 09, 2020: [Letter]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 06, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • July 02, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 04, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Letter]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Continue]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • December 02, 2019: [Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Letter]
  • November 04, 2019: [Remark]
  • November 04, 2019: [Letter]
  • November 04, 2019: [In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order - AEDPA]
  • October 24, 2019: [Compel]
  • October 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 10, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 08, 2019: [Letter]
  • October 01, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • October 01, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 20, 2019: [Remark]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 18, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 13, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • August 29, 2019: [Vacate - 2255]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 24, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 10, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 07, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 05, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 01, 2019: [Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • April 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • April 15, 2019: [Arraignment - Guilty Plea]
  • April 15, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • April 15, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2019: [Arraignment - Guilty Plea]
  • April 01, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • April 01, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 01, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • April 01, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • April 01, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 28, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order]
  • March 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 01, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 11, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order]
  • January 29, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 29, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order]
  • January 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 16, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • December 21, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • December 12, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • December 12, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • December 12, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 06, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 30, 2018: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • November 30, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 30, 2018: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • November 30, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • November 30, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 21, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 19, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • November 19, 2018: [Warrant ]
  • November 19, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • November 19, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.