U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gross
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
  • February 09, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Remark]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 24, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 29, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 28, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 18, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 27, 2021: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order]
  • July 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 23, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 23, 2021: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • July 09, 2019: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 04, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • May 16, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • May 13, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • May 10, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 22, 2019: [Exclude]
  • April 18, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 17, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 16, 2019: [Letter]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order]
  • April 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • April 02, 2019: [Response to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • March 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 04, 2019: [Joinder]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Order]
  • January 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • December 06, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • December 06, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 28, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • November 28, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.