U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carrier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
  • February 16, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 24, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 29, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 28, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 21, 2021: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 27, 2021: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order]
  • July 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • July 26, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 26, 2021: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order]
  • July 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 26, 2021: [Arrest - Prob/Superv. Release Violation Only]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Letter]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • June 26, 2019: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • June 06, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • May 16, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • May 13, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • May 10, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 22, 2019: [Exclude]
  • April 18, 2019: [Letter]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 12, 2019: [Exclude]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order]
  • April 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • April 02, 2019: [Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Letter]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • March 04, 2019: [Joinder]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 25, 2019: [Exclude]
  • February 11, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • February 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 11, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • December 21, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 06, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 28, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • November 28, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.