U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:04-cr-00103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • August 22, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • January 23, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • January 23, 2019: [Response to Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Remark]
  • November 30, 2018: [Early Termination of Probation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.