U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Strand
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Letter]
  • November 02, 2020: [Letter]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 25, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 17, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 17, 2019: [Notice of Service]
  • April 16, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 11, 2019: [Letter]
  • April 11, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 09, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • January 09, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • January 09, 2019: [Arraignment - Guilty Plea]
  • January 09, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 12, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 10, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.