U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holland
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 25, 2021: [Response to Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Remark]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • December 22, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Exhibit List ]
  • September 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • September 23, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
  • September 23, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 26, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 05, 2019: [Information - Felony]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • July 29, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 26, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 25, 2019: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • July 23, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 19, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 18, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 23, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • May 22, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 01, 2019: [Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 23, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 09, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • January 09, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • January 09, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • January 09, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • December 12, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 11, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • December 11, 2018: [Extension of Time to Indict]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.