U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Osbourne
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 13, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • February 13, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • February 13, 2019: [Arraignment - Guilty Plea]
  • February 13, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 26, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.