U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chandler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 10, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 18, 2019: [Letter]
  • June 05, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 08, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • March 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 08, 2019: [Arraignment - Guilty Plea]
  • March 08, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 06, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [Continue]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 08, 2019: [Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 16, 2019: [Continue]
  • January 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 26, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • December 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • December 26, 2018: [Extension of Time to Indict]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.