U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:06-cr-00128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shepherd
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 15, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • May 18, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • May 07, 2021: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • May 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 07, 2021: [Notice - Other]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Oral Order]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 05, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order]
  • June 05, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • June 02, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
  • April 21, 2020: [--Transcript]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order]
  • May 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order]
  • May 09, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Order]
  • April 23, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 23, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 03, 2019: [Letter]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2019: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • March 27, 2019: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Order]
  • January 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 08, 2019: [Transfer In - Return of Supervised Release to this District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.