Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00003-1
    Party Name:USA v. Ortiz
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Hearing]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detain Pending Trial]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Redacted Document]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?67439
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =