U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez-Collazo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 07, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 05, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 22, 2019: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 19, 2019: [Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Order]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • June 19, 2019: [Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 28, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • March 28, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • March 28, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 21, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order]
  • March 21, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • February 26, 2019: [Continue]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 17, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.