U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barrett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
  • October 07, 2019: [--Transcript]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 01, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • July 01, 2019: [Letter]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • June 25, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 18, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 01, 2019: [Oral Order]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • March 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 19, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • March 19, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 18, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • January 18, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 18, 2019: [Criminal Complaint Unsealed]
  • January 18, 2019: [Unseal Case]
  • January 18, 2019: [Redacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.