U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gardiner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • April 02, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 01, 2019: [Response to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Remark]
  • March 08, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order]
  • January 23, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 23, 2019: [Pleadings from Other District - Rule 5c3 - formerly rule 40]
  • January 23, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • January 23, 2019: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.