U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Andres-Juan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [Dismiss]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 28, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • February 01, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • January 25, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.