U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thompson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Status Report ]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 13, 2019: [Exclude]
  • June 06, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • June 06, 2019: [Exit Record]
  • June 06, 2019: [Rule 20 - Transfer Out]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order]
  • May 31, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 31, 2019: [Exclude]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 15, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 14, 2019: [Exclude]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order]
  • May 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Order]
  • March 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 08, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • February 08, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • February 08, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • February 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 01, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • February 01, 2019: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 01, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • January 25, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.