U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Herrera-Perez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • April 02, 2019: [Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • March 28, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • March 28, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • March 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 28, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
  • March 28, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 21, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 21, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order]
  • March 21, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Order]
  • February 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 13, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • February 06, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 01, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.