U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carela-Peralta
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 01, 2019: [Letter]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 27, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • March 27, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • March 27, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 27, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 06, 2019: [Oral Order]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 14, 2019: [Continue]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 06, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 05, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.