U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thompson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • April 22, 2025: [Judgment - Amended]
  • April 22, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 07, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 07, 2025: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • April 07, 2025: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • April 07, 2025: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2022: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 06, 2022: [Exhibit to a Document]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 08, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Reconsideration]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 25, 2022: [Status Report ]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 13, 2022: [Status Report ]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 14, 2022: [Status Report ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order]
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 13, 2021: [Status Report ]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 13, 2021: [Status Report ]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 12, 2021: [Status Report ]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 18, 2021: [Status Report ]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order]
  • May 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 22, 2021: [Status Conference - Deft. present]
  • April 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Bond]
  • February 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order]
  • November 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 25, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order]
  • November 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2020: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 06, 2020: [Exclude]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Order]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 16, 2020: [Exclude]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Reply Brief/Memorandum]
  • July 10, 2020: [Brief/Memorandum in Opposition]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [Status Report ]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2020: [Order]
  • March 24, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • March 16, 2020: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
  • March 16, 2020: [--Transcript]
  • March 11, 2020: [Exhibit List ]
  • March 06, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order]
  • January 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 21, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 21, 2020: [Sealed Document]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order]
  • November 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • October 02, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • October 02, 2019: [Redacted Document]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • August 23, 2019: [Discovery]
  • August 23, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2019: [Produce]
  • August 23, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • August 23, 2019: [Suppress Evidence]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 25, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • June 24, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • June 24, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 10, 2019: [Letter]
  • May 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order]
  • March 13, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 11, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Order]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 13, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • February 08, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • February 08, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • February 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 08, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 05, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • February 05, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.