U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chalas-Felix
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 30, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • September 22, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 13, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • August 13, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • August 13, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 20, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Order]
  • May 13, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • May 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 13, 2020: [Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Order]
  • April 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • April 22, 2020: [Status Report ]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 17, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 26, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 26, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 06, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 06, 2020: [Letter]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Interpreter Requested]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 04, 2019: [Speedy Trial]
  • December 04, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 21, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 05, 2019: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • August 02, 2019: [Letter]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 16, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2019: [Exhibit List ]
  • July 11, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [Protective Order]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
May, 2019
  • May 27, 2019: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • May 24, 2019: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Letter]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • April 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 24, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2019: [Suppress Evidence]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • March 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 21, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • March 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • February 22, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • February 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • February 15, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.