U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. O'Hara
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Order]
  • January 16, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [Seal Document]
  • January 02, 2020: [Seal]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Seal Document]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Letter]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 04, 2019: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • September 04, 2019: [Seal Document]
  • September 04, 2019: [Redacted Document]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 13, 2019: [Seal Document]
  • August 12, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Seal Document]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 08, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • July 08, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 01, 2019: [Letter]
  • July 01, 2019: [Certificate of Good Standing]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • June 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 12, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 03, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • April 03, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • April 03, 2019: [Arraignment - Guilty Plea]
  • April 03, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 15, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.