U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [--Transcript]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [--Transcript]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 18, 2022: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
  • July 15, 2022: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment]
  • July 11, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
  • July 11, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • July 06, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 31, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order of Probable Cause]
  • July 07, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 07, 2021: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • July 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 07, 2021: [Arrest - Prob/Superv. Release Violation Only]
  • July 07, 2021: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • July 07, 2021: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [USCA Order Terminating Appeal]
  • January 04, 2021: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment]
  • December 30, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 18, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • December 16, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 14, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 09, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 09, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 02, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 02, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 17, 2020: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order]
  • September 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order]
  • September 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 03, 2020: [Letter]
  • September 03, 2020: [In Limine]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • August 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 20, 2020: [Status Conference - Deft. present]
  • August 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 03, 2020: [Letter]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order]
  • July 31, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 31, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 30, 2020: [Status Conference - Deft. not present]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order]
  • July 20, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 20, 2020: [Exclude]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order]
  • July 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 09, 2020: [Verdict Sheet - Proposed]
  • July 09, 2020: [Voir Dire - Proposed]
  • July 09, 2020: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
  • July 09, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • July 02, 2020: [In Limine]
  • July 01, 2020: [In Limine]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 22, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • June 22, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • June 12, 2020: [Order]
  • June 12, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
  • May 20, 2020: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL - Conditions of Release]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress Evidence]
  • May 12, 2020: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • May 04, 2020: [Letter]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 20, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • April 13, 2020: [Bond]
  • April 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 03, 2020: [Status Report ]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2020: [Compel]
  • March 18, 2020: [Quash]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2020: [Letter]
  • March 01, 2020: [--Transcript]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order]
  • February 12, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order]
  • January 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 15, 2020: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • January 15, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Order]
  • December 27, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 20, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • December 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • December 13, 2019: [Remark]
  • December 13, 2019: [Brief/Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order]
  • December 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 05, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 02, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • December 01, 2019: [Suppress Evidence]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 18, 2019: [Exhibit List ]
  • November 18, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • November 15, 2019: [Letter]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Letter]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 17, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2019: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • October 07, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 03, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 13, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 08, 2019: [Suppress Evidence]
  • August 08, 2019: [Discovery]
  • August 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order]
  • June 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • June 14, 2019: [Redacted Document]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • March 25, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • March 25, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • March 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 22, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • March 22, 2019: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2019: [Arrest ]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • February 26, 2019: [Warrant ]
  • February 26, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • February 26, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.