U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Segovia-Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • April 26, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • April 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • April 26, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • April 26, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 24, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 13, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 26, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.