U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flagg
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 24, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 04, 2021: [Letter]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • February 17, 2021: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
  • February 16, 2021: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL - Other]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • January 11, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • January 08, 2021: [Letter]
  • January 07, 2021: [Letter]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 17, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 14, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 10, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • December 09, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 04, 2020: [Letter]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 09, 2020: [Remark]
  • October 09, 2020: [Letter]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • September 22, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Letter]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • September 24, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order]
  • August 27, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 27, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 26, 2019: [Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order]
  • June 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 12, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 19, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 13, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • March 13, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 13, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • March 13, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 06, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 05, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.