U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Canda Quach
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Exit Record]
  • April 07, 2025: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • August 11, 2022: [Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 26, 2022: [Reduce Sentence]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 20, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 13, 2021: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
  • April 13, 2021: [--Transcript]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Remark]
  • March 11, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 08, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 04, 2021: [USCA Order Terminating Appeal]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Letter]
  • January 05, 2021: [Letter]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Letter]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
  • March 03, 2020: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 13, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • February 13, 2020: [Sentencing]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 11, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • December 10, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Order]
  • September 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 18, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Order]
  • August 14, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 07, 2019: [Letter]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order]
  • June 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2019: [Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 06, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • March 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 06, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order]
  • March 05, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • March 05, 2019: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.