U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Washington
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment - Amended]
  • January 17, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • January 08, 2023: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 08, 2023: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • January 08, 2023: [Brady Order]
  • January 08, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 08, 2023: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 08, 2023: [Arrest - Prob/Superv. Release Violation Only]
  • January 08, 2023: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 07, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 22, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • January 21, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Status Report ]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order]
  • June 21, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 02, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 11, 2019: [Order]
  • April 11, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 09, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Order]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • March 15, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • March 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 15, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • March 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 13, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 08, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • March 08, 2019: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 08, 2019: [Unseal Case]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 08, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 08, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • March 08, 2019: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.