U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Letter]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • September 20, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 19, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • September 18, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 18, 2019: [Downward Departure]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 22, 2019: [Order]
  • April 22, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • April 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • April 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • March 29, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • March 20, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 15, 2019: [Indictment]
  • March 15, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 15, 2019: [Unseal Case]
  • March 15, 2019: [Criminal Complaint Unsealed]
  • March 15, 2019: [Redacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.