U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Campusano Mercedes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • May 24, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • May 24, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • May 24, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • May 24, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
  • May 24, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 23, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 21, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • May 21, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 17, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 20, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 18, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.