U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Evans
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence- USSC Amendment -18:3582c2]
  • August 24, 2021: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
  • August 19, 2021: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • July 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 04, 2021: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • June 04, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 04, 2021: [Seal Document]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Letter]
  • May 20, 2021: [Letter]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 13, 2021: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment - 18:3582c2]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • November 02, 2020: [Letter]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Judgment]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 29, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • September 16, 2020: [Exhibit List ]
  • September 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • September 15, 2020: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
  • September 11, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 08, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 01, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Order]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • June 05, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 24, 2020: [Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 14, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • November 14, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • November 14, 2019: [Arraignment - Guilty Plea]
  • November 14, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 14, 2019: [Information - Felony]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Order]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 08, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Order]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 14, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 13, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order]
  • May 22, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 02, 2019: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • May 01, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • April 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • April 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.