U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chartworld Shipping Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Letter]
  • March 09, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • February 18, 2020: [Brief/Memorandum in Opposition]
  • February 11, 2020: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • February 07, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • January 27, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 27, 2020: [Notice - Other]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Letter]
  • November 08, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 08, 2019: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • November 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 04, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order]
  • October 31, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 28, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 18, 2019: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 17, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • October 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • October 15, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
  • October 02, 2019: [Interpreter Requested]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 02, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • October 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • October 02, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 01, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 01, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • October 01, 2019: [Pretrial Memorandum ]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Adopt Co-Defendant's Motion]
  • September 26, 2019: [Voir Dire - Proposed]
  • September 26, 2019: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
  • September 26, 2019: [In Limine]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • September 18, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Transcript Request]
  • August 29, 2019: [Remark]
  • August 23, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 23, 2019: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • August 19, 2019: [Witness List]
  • August 19, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • August 15, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • August 13, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 07, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • August 05, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • August 01, 2019: [Response to Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • July 16, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 15, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 15, 2019: [Reply Brief/Memorandum]
  • July 15, 2019: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • July 10, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • July 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 01, 2019: [Reply Brief/Memorandum]
  • July 01, 2019: [Response to Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 28, 2019: [Adopt Co-Defendant's Motion]
  • June 28, 2019: [Reply Brief/Memorandum]
  • June 26, 2019: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • June 26, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 26, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 24, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 21, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 14, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 14, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order]
  • June 13, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2019: [Correct]
  • June 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 10, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • June 10, 2019: [Adopt Co-Defendant's Motion]
  • June 10, 2019: [Take Deposition]
  • June 10, 2019: [Suppress Statements]
  • June 10, 2019: [Suppress Evidence]
  • June 10, 2019: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • June 10, 2019: [Strike]
  • June 10, 2019: [Compel]
  • June 10, 2019: [Scheduling Conference - Deft. not present]
  • June 09, 2019: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • June 09, 2019: [Hearing]
  • June 09, 2019: [Compel]
  • June 08, 2019: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • June 08, 2019: [Take Deposition]
  • June 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 06, 2019: [Sever Defendant]
  • June 06, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 06, 2019: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • June 06, 2019: [Compel]
  • June 06, 2019: [Letter]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • June 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 03, 2019: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • June 03, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • May 31, 2019: [Bail Hearing - not revocation]
  • May 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order]
  • May 24, 2019: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • May 21, 2019: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • May 20, 2019: [Hearing]
  • May 17, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 13, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 09, 2019: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • May 09, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • May 01, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • April 30, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.